Case Information: 35514 | |||
Short Caption: | FARMER (WILLIAM) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR982651 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/19/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/19/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 00-00887 | |
01/26/2000 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 00-01276 | |
02/18/2000 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 00-03418 | |
02/18/2000 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 00-03419 | |
03/09/2000 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 00-03740 | |
05/25/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Remand. "We therefore remand this matter to the district court to determine whether appellant was incarcerated for any period of time that falls outside of the limited agreement to waive credit for time served while waiting for placement in WestCare, and to give appellant credit for such presentence incarceration if appellant is otherwise legally entitled to that credit." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | 00-08780 | |
06/20/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-10315 | |
06/20/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/30/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 22, 2000. | 00-10315 |