Case: B-6798
B-6798
05/27/1977
Application for Writ of Error
FRANK ODIS ROGERS
TERI LYN ROGERS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/09/1977 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
05/27/1977 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/04/1978 | Opinion issued | | ||
11/07/1977 | Miscellaneous Motion | | ||
07/27/1977 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
07/27/1977 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
06/09/1977 | Response to Petition | | ||
05/27/1977 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
05/27/1977 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Teri Lyn Rogers | Respondent | |
Frank Odis Rogers | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information