Case Heading (S-20-0191) | |||||
Case Number: | S-20-0191 | Case Docketed On: | 08/26/2020 | ||
Status: | Oral/Under Advisement | ||||
Original Court: | Sixth Judicial District Campbell County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Morals, Decency and Family 6-4-101 - 6-4-502 | ||
Short Title: | WILLIAM THOMAS MAHAFFY V v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | WILLIAM THOMAS MAHAFFY V, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | William Thomas Mahaffy V | Diane M. Lozano Kirk Allan Morgan |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Bridget L. Hill Jenny Lynn Craig Joshua Charles Eames Timothy Paul Zintak |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop |
Opinion Number: | |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
08/26/2020 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
08/26/2020 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
08/26/2020 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
10/07/2020 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
10/08/2020 | Event - Hardcopy received - (Appellant's) Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
10/08/2020 | Order Granting Appellant's Request for Extension to File Brief | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
10/27/2020 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
10/28/2020 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/10/2020 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
12/11/2020 | Notice-Outgoing - Notice of case maturity | Notice-Outgoing | Notice of case maturity | Final | |
12/11/2020 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received Designation of Record | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/23/2020 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
12/29/2020 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
12/31/2020 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting received by Kirk A. Morgan obo appellant | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
01/06/2021 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume 1, Original Papers; Volume 2, Transcripts (4); Volume 3, Confidential Folder. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
01/07/2021 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Timothy P. Zintak obo Appellee | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
01/11/2021 | Notice-Incoming - Additional authority | Notice-Incoming | Additional authority | Final | |
01/12/2021 | Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Additional Authority | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
01/20/2021 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before Chief Justice Davis, Justices Fox, Kautz, Boomgaarden and Gray (Kirk Morgan obo appellant and Timothy Zintak obo Appellee) and taken under advisement | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final |