Case Information: 82-CM-1060 | |||
Short Caption: | RILEY, WILLIAM L. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | M1534-82 | Filed Date: | 08/04/1982 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 08/04/1982 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 04/25/1983 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 08/04/1983 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 11/09/1983 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | RILEY, WILLIAM L. UNITED STATES | |||
08/04/1982 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
04/25/1983 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
08/04/1983 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
11/09/1983 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
11/10/1983 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |