Case Information: 86-BG-1590 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: PAUL G. EVANS | Classification: | Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | 11/21/1986 | |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 11/21/1986 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 02/25/1987 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 02/25/1987 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 05/20/1987 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||||||||
Petitioner | Bar Counsel | N |
| ||||||||||||
Petitioner | Board on Professional Responsibility | N |
| ||||||||||||
Respondent | Paul G. Evans | N | Pro Se | N |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | EVANS, PAUL G. IN THE MATTER OF: | |||
11/21/1986 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
02/25/1987 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
02/25/1987 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
05/20/1987 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
08/05/1987 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |