Case Information: 35523 | |||
Short Caption: | RODRIGUES VS. SWEATT | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9801016 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 02/15/2000 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/21/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/21/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-00956 | |
02/07/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] | 00-01862 | |
02/15/2000 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Mailed on 02/11/00. | 00-02366 | |
02/15/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
03/07/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Strike. Motion to Strike Opening Brief of Appellant. | 00-03624 | |
04/14/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "We ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn[In light of this order, we deny as moot respondents' motion to strike appellant's opening brief. Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from apppellant.] - SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | 00-05991 | |
05/03/2000 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. w/letter: "Notice of Appeal" and "Appellant's Brief in Support." | ||
05/10/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal. | 00-07706 | |
05/10/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/04/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 28, 2002. | 00-07706 |