Case Information: 82-CM-0905 | |||
Short Caption: | JOHNSON, RALPH UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Weapons Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | M13801-81 | Filed Date: | 07/02/1982 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 07/02/1982 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 11/09/1982 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 05/04/1983 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 07/12/1983 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | JOHNSON, RALPH UNITED STATES | |||
07/02/1982 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
11/09/1982 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
05/04/1983 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
07/12/1983 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition | ||
07/12/1983 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted |