Case Information: 37116 | |||
Short Caption: | WILLIAMS (CURTIS) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 37723 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR971572 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/06/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/06/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-21322 | |
01/23/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML | 01-01473 | |
02/21/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-01509 | |
02/21/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/27/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 23, 2001. | 01-01509 |