Case Information: 35506 | |||
Short Caption: | HILDEBRAND VS. DISTRICT COURT | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV14530 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/18/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
01/18/2000 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 00-00813 | |
01/18/2000 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Appendix to Petition for Writ of Preemptory Mandamus. | 00-00815 | |
01/27/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due from the real party in interest: 20 days from the date of this order. | 00-01334 | |
02/02/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | ||
02/09/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Payment of Filing Fee. | 00-02079 | |
02/09/2000 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Christopherson Law Offices-check no. 3781. | ||
02/16/2000 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. | 00-02454 | |
02/16/2000 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Appendix to Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 00-02455 | |
06/14/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Granting Petition. " . . . we grant the petition." We direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | 00-10087 | |
06/14/2000 | Writ | Issued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Ian Christopherson for service upon Judge John P. Davis. | 00-10140 | |
07/11/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 00-11812 | |
07/11/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/18/2000 | Writ | Filed Writ. Served on Judge Davis on July 14, 2000. | 00-10140 |