judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBINSON, DAHL W. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CM-0793
Short Caption:ROBINSON, DAHL W. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:06/15/1982

Opening Event Date:06/15/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/15/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/09/1984
Argued/Submitted:04/04/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
M. Elizabeth Kent YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ROBINSON, DAHL W. UNITED STATES
06/15/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/15/1983FiledRecord Completed
01/09/1984FiledBriefing Completed
04/04/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/06/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition