Case: 03-97-00580-CV
03-97-00580-CV
09/29/1997
Contract
First General Realty Corporation; First Mortgage Company of Texas, Inc.; First General Realty Corporation and Pacific Gulf Investment Corporation d/b/a River Plantation Development Company, Inc., et al.
Maryland Casualty Company, National Standard Insurance Company and American General Fire & Casualty Company
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/15/2012 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |||||
10/05/2000 | Case stored | | |||||
11/03/1999 | Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk | | |||||
06/21/1999 | Letter requesting pickup of exhibits | | |||||
06/21/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |||||
05/06/1999 | Peition for Review disposed in Supreme Court | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||
01/14/1999 | Peition for Review disposed in Supreme Court | | |||||
11/30/1998 | Judgment withdrawn | | |||||
11/30/1998 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | | ||||
11/30/1998 | Opinion Withdrawn | | |||||
11/30/1998 | Substitute Opinion | Affirmed |
| ||||
11/16/1998 | Response to Motion | | |||||
11/06/1998 | Response requested (postcard) | | |||||
11/05/1998 | Letter received | | |||||
09/11/1998 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |||||
09/09/1998 | Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
09/02/1998 | Extension on rehearing filed. | | |||||
08/13/1998 | Opinion issued | Affirmed in part; Reversed and Remanded in part | | ||||
05/29/1998 | Letter brief filed | | |||||
05/27/1998 | Submitted | | |||||
05/27/1998 | Submission | | |||||
05/11/1998 | Reply brief filed | | |||||
05/05/1998 | Mt file Supp Record Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
05/05/1998 | Supplemental Record Filed | | |||||
04/29/1998 | Mt file Supplemental Record Filed | | |||||
04/29/1998 | Supplemental Record Received | | |||||
04/27/1998 | Oral argument acknowledged | | |||||
04/20/1998 | Oral argument acknowledged | | |||||
04/20/1998 | Brief filed | | |||||
04/15/1998 | Submission | | |||||
04/14/1998 | Cancellation of Submission Date | | |||||
04/09/1998 | Submission | | |||||
04/03/1998 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
03/20/1998 | Letter received | | |||||
02/18/1998 | Brief filed | | |||||
02/10/1998 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
02/04/1998 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||||
01/12/1998 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
01/06/1998 | Mt file Supp Record Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
01/05/1998 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||||
12/15/1997 | Supplemental Record Filed | | |||||
12/15/1997 | Mt file Supplemental Record Filed | | |||||
12/15/1997 | Supplemental Record Received | | |||||
12/04/1997 | Exhibits filed | | |||||
12/04/1997 | Transcript & SF Filed | | |||||
12/01/1997 | Exhibits received | | |||||
12/01/1997 | Clerk's Record Overdue | | |||||
10/27/1997 | Exhibits received | | |||||
10/27/1997 | Statement of Facts Received | | |||||
10/07/1997 | Staff recommendation for mediation | No for mediation | | ||||
09/29/1997 | Docketing statement received | | |||||
09/29/1997 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||||
09/29/1997 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/21/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Dooley, Kenneth D. & Frances A | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Will, Buell R. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Mccoy, Charlotte A. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Jordan, Gail R. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Barron, Oscar Noel | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Kinney, III, Robert D. & Barba | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Dini, Richard F. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Cox, Edward R. & Karen L. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Mcbride, P. T. & Lois | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Weaver, Jody | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Houlihan, Daniel K. & Peggy An | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Tiernan, Jr., Lawrence E. & An | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Seale, III, Fred G. & Fredrick | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Motion, Benjamin H. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Mckenna, Cyril C. & June W. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Moore, Jimmy R. & Jeannie K. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Pratt, Beverly J. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Travis, C. T. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Urbano, Mario F. & Esther M. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Booth, Matthew F. & Jean E. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Falco, Michael & Francine | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Pace, Richard S. & Marge S. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Gerlach, Vergil R. & Janice A. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Somerville, Jack E. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Costa, Patsy A. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Lassiter, Ronald C. & Ella Lee | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Ramsey, Carole | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Dill, Terry & Iris | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Moter, Jr., Jay M. & Pearl G. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Styers, Clara Gay | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Riley, VIctor | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Langworthy, Theodore F. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Devine, David W. & Leona M. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Strickland, Ronnie O. & Stacie | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Smith, VIrgel O. & Alice W. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Kain, Joseph D. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Drewery, Kelton D. & Elizabeth | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Reed, Norma J. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Lewis, Jr., Charles H. & Annie | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Wagner, VIctor O. & Enola M. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Brown, Randall H. & Constance | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Holder, E. M. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Peters, Frank R. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Clement, Edwena | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Roth, Kenneth M. & Lillian | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Mccollum, James Lloyd & Barbar | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Roberts, Richard J. & Kathleen | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Forsman, James C. & Judith R. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Schmidt, Thomas E. & Barbara J | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Smith, Curtis K. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Thomason, William E. & Rita K. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Foster, Arthur W. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Coker, Elizabeth Clark | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Kilpatrick, Donald M. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Waters, Ben I. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Wortham, Randolph | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Kirkpatrick, Donald M. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Landry, Janet S. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Cox, Richard T. & Patricia L. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Kinnamon, Joe | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Three C Consulting, Inc. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
St. Jean, Rene P. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Acheson, VIctor R. & Mary J. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Delscheff, G. J. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Brenholts, Jr., Alfred R., As | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Smith, Paul L. & H. Jane | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
River Plantation Development C | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Donehoo, Shirley J. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Guadino, Joseph H. & Mildred L | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Crenwelge, Richard | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
First General Realty Corporati | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren Mr. Ronald D. Wren Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Bennett, VIolet M. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Zimmerman, Ronald K. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Dewey, David P. & Riki F. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Chancy, Eugene J. & Donna G. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Preston, Jr., William A. & Sha | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
William Jerry A. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Moon, M.D., Joseph K. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Brace, Douglas A. & Camille M. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Fitch, Jack A. & Pamela J. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Kelleher, William & Betty | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Hurn, Bonnie J. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Ruffer, Frank A. & Mary Elizab | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Sechler, James W. & Darlene R. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Snow, Lorn J. & Mary L. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Leigh, Wiliam C. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Maclaurin, Leonard A. & Joan M | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
O`rorke, Robert G. & Jean G. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
West, Richard A. & Judith C. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Walker, Luther B. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Lind, Larry | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Herbert, Tildon J. & Carolyn B | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Rodenbush, Richard A. & Linda | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Kershinik, David | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Druley, John & Cynthia | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Clapham, Wanda Individually A | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Rexford, Robert S. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Krupala, Marcus W. & Annette | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
King, John D. Benjamin Frankl | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Metts, M. D. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Grimm, M. Jack | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Adams, James Wesley & Billie B | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Oppel, Ted W. & Jo | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Cano, Tommy L. & Margaret | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Slape, Don T. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Quinlan, III, Garrett John & J | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Baugh, William H. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Holiway, Weldon Y. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Zimmeran, Chalmers D. & Judith | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Lowry, And Earl G. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Maynard, S. K. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Bausbacher, Edward F. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Holbrook, Robert B. & Christin | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Dunn, Shirley | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Herb, President, Marvin & Trea | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Albaum, Joseph And Ann M. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Rivette, Paul G. & Merle W. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Termeer, John Joseph & VIrgini | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Donovan, John M. & Jacqueline | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Mayes, Walter D. & Ida F. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Curtsinger, Jack R. & Melanie | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Hollansky, John L. & Jeannette | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Fitzjarrell, Maxine C. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Sinchak, Robert | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Frazier, James F. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Blum, Melvin J. & VIrginia | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Galup, James M. & Dianne M. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Cook, Jerry L. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Mcafee, Jr., Wallace Lionel & | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Jaggers, Charles | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Boyle, Anthony | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Abney, Joe L. And Paula K. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Zirkle, Robert G. & Judith S. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Morrison, Leroy E. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Smith, Gordon A. & Anne M. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Motion, Helen F. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Godfrey, Jr., John A. & Norma | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Davis, Kenneth G. & Katherine | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Jacobsen, J. C. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Riley, Robert J. & Joyce L. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Hill, Joanne | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Guth, Arthur J. & Mabel S. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Kuhn, Georgia | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Alexander, Laurie R. D. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Longino, Homer A. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Lentz, Elwood I. & Clara F. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Blackburne, Jr., Edward | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
First Mortgage Company Of Texa | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Mailhes, Louis Eugene & Eileen | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Dixon, James A. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Mardaga, L. W. & Anne M. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Voigt, Sandra E. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Fankhanel, Martin O. & Barbara | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Mills, And David G. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Denman, Charles F. & Carlene S | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Hagan, Harold J. & Sara J. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Mayes, Jim | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Allen, Larry G. & Beverly A. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Haass, Charles E. & Mildred F. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Jacoby, Kenneth H. & Loretta E | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Powell, Lewis & N. Faye Catron | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Drackett, Jr., John R. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Meeks, Fred C. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Wendt, Ronald C. & Jeannene | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Graumlich, David & Diana | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Shepherd, Donald R. & Elizabet | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Blackburn, Barry G. & Ilene F. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Bannantine, George A. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Lutenbacher, Harold L. & Imoge | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Holder, Perry J. & Iris S. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Smith, Archibald & Dorothy A. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Hansen, Gerald E. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Tuggle, Arthur J. & Jarvis | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Powell, Jesse C. & Sandra Owen | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Miller, Robert E. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Parson, Billy B. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Erwin, William G. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Standfield, Gary L. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Oglesbee, Ronald M. & Margaret | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Haack, Gail R. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
American General Fire & Casual | Appellee | Mr. Barry K. Bishop Mr. Ted Mishtal |
Donnell, Robert D. & Susan M. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Hess, J. Ann | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Wetzel, Don A. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Bullock, Robert J. & Marie R. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Nemetz, Anita | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Lindsey, G. B. & Stella | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
White, James J. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Killingworth, Ernest | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Worthy, Donna D. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Bybee, William C. & Dorothy J. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Byerly, Dalton R. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Roe, Charles E. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Dressler, Louis J. & Ada D. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Dupuy, James R. & Mary G. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Warfield, S. Barry & Carol Lyn | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Day, Charles A. & Sylvia L. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Ramirez, Hector | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Erickson, Carl D. & Sandra | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Batson, Albert L. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Lightner, James E. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Jemison, Lee & Georgene | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Cook, Andrew B. & Betty B. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Dietz, William H. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Malone, Jr., William L. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Rutherford, Gay N. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Wilson, William & Ruth K. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Slover, Richard C. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Van Deusen, James R. & Neva Ca | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Lawrence, Stephen | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Pace, John A. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Storey, Bill R. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Hinson, John W. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Mcrae, Richard G. & Mariann R. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Martin, Trustee, David P. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Rose, Charles | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Flemming, Homer V. & Florence | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Brubaker, William E. & Sharon | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Kern, Keith D. & Cynthia | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Keir, Caryl S. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Blair, Cleve E. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Amato, Benjamin B. & Veronica | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Weeks, Samuel J. & Louise G. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Mcdowell, A. N. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Garcia, Carlos | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Garrison, Robert K. & Alexis | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Dietz, Dorothy E. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Tipton, J. D. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Gallagher, Thomas A. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Brown, Merlyn E. & Carol C. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Waldo, Ii, Albigence L. & Caro | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Davis, Richard | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Sholtess, Calvin D. & Frances | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Stockstill, Howard/trademark C | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Crawford, Timothy B. & Robin V | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Anderson, Lillian R. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Gross, D. B. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Driscoll, William J. & Karen A | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Russell, Carson M. & Merle | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Fercho, Frederick Rodney & Col | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Keppler, Bruce W. & Margaret R | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Wickham, Ii, George H. & Sue | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Regan, Frank M. & Gloria L. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Gill, Laurence E. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Jones, Helen Sue | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Bickel, R. Arthur | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Reed, William F. & Judith L. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Reeves, H. W. & Maurine G. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Galegher, Kerry & Linda | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Compton, Marshall & Hellen S. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Olson, Howard L. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Wingo, Mary M. Turner | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Turner, Ralph E. & Sylvia P. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Shoemaker, Stanley | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Edwards, Julia M. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Hayes, Bobby A. & Marjorie Lyn | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Arnold, Steve | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Brenholts, Heloise S. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Pillow, Sandra K. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Foss, F. E. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Granados, Betty L. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Magness, J. A. & Madeline S. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Beitel, Remsen H. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Boone, Paul | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Pippin, Shirley H. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Chambers, Patricia | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Weaver, Jr., J. D. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Donehoo, Jr., George W. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Bauer, Roy A. & Sylvia | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Nelson, VIolet M. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Varner, Herbert W. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Anderson, Howard W. & Stella J | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Clark, George | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Boughton, Nola Jean Individua | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Morrison, E. D. & Josephine | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Long, Charles P. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Hull, Sylvia A. Individually | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Frazier, Bruce H. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Vahabzadeh, Dara | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Mckillip, Kirby G. & Carol J. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Judge, Richard J. & Delores B. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Nettles, James H. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Mashburn, R. Howard & Nancy V. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Walker, Bill J. & Evelyn Mozel | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Bunch, Paul C. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Pangman, Carol S. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Vesel, Lawrence | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Worthy, Dorothy W. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Bryan, David C. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Ryan, Michael J. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Parker, Ronald G. & Mary Carol | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Stocking, Don & Susan | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Mcdaniel, E. A. & Evelyn | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Davidson, Ii, James S. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Rolfe, Larry M. & Patricia Rus | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Klein, William W. & Lillian C. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Bozman, J. A. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
New Life Homes, Inc. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Reeves, Robert David & Catheri | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Borkowski, Harry & Irene | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Baker, Eldon R. & Herta M. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Molohosky, Serge P. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Pyle, Jr., J. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Plank, Betty F. Individually | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Norman, James H. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Stephens, C. L. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Tyson, Weldon W. & Rita J. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Bryson, Phil | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Brown, Doris Ann | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Morton, Edgar A. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Coterillo, Winifred H. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Guajardo, Ruben G. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Wiles, Stephen G. & Theda R. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Wisner, Thomas | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Beckler, Edward B. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Crumpacker, Ernest L. & Anne B | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Johnston, James L. & Melba J. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Ditchman, Gustave A. & Susan M | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Thayer, Anne L. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Gorwood, William G. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Allman, Jr., Commander J. C. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Razin, Rudolph R. & Edna E. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Thompson, Robert | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Broom, Jr., Knox M. & Margaret | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Burch, Robert F. & Barbara A. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Barry, Don W. & Polly S. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Olson, Frank T. & Judy | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Roberts, Jerry J. & Jan | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Sinclair, Stephen J. & Mary D. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Hall, Christine Mcdonald | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Kutach, Frank | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Blakely, William C. & Ann N. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Posey, Sr., John Jos. & VIrgin | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Webber, Richard F. & Harriett | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Paul, Ronald L. & Joyce G. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Mccrory, Patsy C. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Marshall, Norris A. & Ann L. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Logan, Thomas L. & Melba H. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Barnett, Marie M. As Independ | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Johnston, James K. & Rose M. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Maryland Casualty Company | Appellee | Mr. Barry K. Bishop Mr. Ted Mishtal |
Reinhardt, Charles F. & Sharon | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Schminkey, Don D. & Carol L. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
West, B. G. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Lunger, Larry E. & Cathy Sue | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Coyne, David | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Gallegher, Dorothy F. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Najar, Jr., Manual T. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Tuttle, John E. & Delores M. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Miller, Douglas F. & Sandra L. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Noble, Michael A. & Sandra J. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Kovach, And Paul | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Mcniece, Robert | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Conner, J. F. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Thomas, James E. & Joyce D. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Dixon, Jerry V. & Sharon L. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Monroe, John Allen | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Craig, Ronald L. & Marcella L. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Whittington, Pauline Individu | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Stanley, Charles F. & Jonnie L | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Hurn, William T. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Anderson, Howard M. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
White, William W. & Norma C. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Gilmer, Vance M. & Reva H. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Johnson, Richard James & Lois | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
National Standard Insurance Co | Appellee | Mr. Ted Mishtal Mr. Barry K. Bishop |
Kleene, Jr., Thomas H. & Sharo | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Jordan, Verne E. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Jensen, R. E. & Helen E. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Bianchi, David C. & Ann H. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Hughes, Ben F. & Judith F. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Meyer, Charles H. & Mary Lou | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Sims, Joyce M. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Pennington, Susann | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Brandon, Jr., Carl J. & Hazel M | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Darwin, Robert C. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Turnbull, Robert P. & Shirley | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Mcdonald, Robert | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Hove, A. S. & Beverly | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Zimmerman, Dennis R. & Myrlene | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Mclean, Thomas J. & Sarah S. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Thomas, Erma L. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Thompson, Russell G. & Beatric | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Beutow, Don C. & Mary L. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Platt, H. W. & Betty | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Offutt, David | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Sifferman, Paul O. & Louise E. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Hamlin, Ralph & Nancy | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Landowski, John W. & Janet L. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Nemetz, George R. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Ireland, Carolyn L. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Warner, William F. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Shelton, Robert W. & Carolyn G | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Simmons, Roy & Jan | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
East, Michael A. & Donna B. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Van Derbur, Charles A. & Hazel | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Dindot, Jacqueline | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Jones, & Paul Dewey | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Brewer, Malcolm & Beverly | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Davidson, Jack R. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Hancock, James | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Feuer, Robert A. & Phyllis J. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Graham, William G. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Stark, John A. & Sandra H. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Schraeder, Harvey & Madeline | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Wallace, Thomas E. & Nancy J. | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Langlois, Leo M. & R. Eileen | Appellant | Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
Trial Court Information
126th District Court
Travis
Honorable John K. Dietz
428,878