Case: 04-00-00279-CV
04-00-00279-CV
05/08/2000
Summary Judgment
Minerva Cantu and Raul Cantu
Jorge F. Peacher, M.D.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/15/2011 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
01/07/2002 | Mandate Issued | | |
12/28/2001 | Higher Court Decision | Motion or Writ Denied | |
11/08/2001 | Higher Court Decision | Motion or Writ Denied | |
09/24/2001 | Information regarding cause received | | |
07/23/2001 | Information regarding cause received | | |
05/15/2001 | Information regarding cause received | | |
05/11/2001 | Information regarding cause received | | |
04/23/2001 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
04/06/2001 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
02/26/2001 | Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/16/2001 | Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
02/07/2001 | Concurring Opinion | | |
02/07/2001 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
02/07/2001 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
01/03/2001 | Submitted | | |
12/06/2000 | Submission | Motion or Writ Denied | |
10/30/2000 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/30/2000 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
10/30/2000 | Brief Filed | | |
10/24/2000 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disp/Per Curiam/Clerk's Order | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/23/2000 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
10/20/2000 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
10/04/2000 | Information regarding cause received | | |
08/23/2000 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disp/Per Curiam/Clerk's Order | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/18/2000 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
08/14/2000 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
08/14/2000 | Brief Filed | | |
07/17/2000 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disp/Per Curiam/Clerk's Order | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/10/2000 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
06/14/2000 | Clerks Record Filed | | |
06/01/2000 | Case NOT referred to mediation. ADR file closed. | | |
05/24/2000 | ADR Addendum filed | | |
05/23/2000 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
05/23/2000 | Information regarding cause received | | |
05/22/2000 | Objections to Motion Filed | | |
05/22/2000 | ADR Addendum filed | | |
05/08/2000 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
05/08/2000 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
05/08/2000 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
05/08/2000 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
05/08/2000 | Information regarding cause received | | |
05/08/2000 | Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case | | |
05/08/2000 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
03/09/2000 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
02/15/2000 | Judgment Signed in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/15/2011 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Jorge F. Peacher, M.D. | Appellee | George G. Brin Thomas F. Nye Linda C. Breck |
Minerva Cantu And Raul Cantu | Appellant | David M. Adkisson |
Trial Court Information
150th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Phylis J. Speedlin
1998-CI-07718