Case Information: 37102 | |||
Short Caption: | STATE VS. KUIPER (TY) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C167052 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/04/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/04/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-21157 | |
12/05/2000 | Other | Other. Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel. | ||
01/17/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 01-01016 | |
01/17/2001 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Volumes 1 and 2. | 01-01017 | |
02/08/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 01-02624 | |
05/17/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Dispositional Order/Appeal. "ORDER the judgment of the district court VACATED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for sentencing and the entry of a judgment of conviction pursuant to the jury's verdicts." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR | 01-08208 | |
06/12/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-08421 | |
06/12/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/05/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 19, 2001. | 01-08421 |