Case Information: 35512 | |||
Short Caption: | MORALES (JAMES) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C133020 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/19/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/19/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-00879 | |
01/19/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Status Report. It appears this appeal has been abandoned. Attorney McNicholas shall inform this court of the status of this appeal within 20 days of the date of this order. | 00-00880 | |
01/28/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 00-01446 | |
03/23/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. fn1[The Nevada Rules of appellate Procedure in effect prior to the September 1, 1996, revisions and amendments govern this appeal.] On January 28, 2000, attorney McNicholas filed a document entitled "dismissal of appeal" which states that " appellant . . . hereby dismisses the appeal." Cause appearing, " . . . we order this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | 00-04661 | |
03/23/2000 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |