judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

F AND C ENGINEERING COMPANY v. STATE OF TEXAS AND THE TEXAS HIGHWAY DEPARTMENT

Case: B-1451
B-1451
03/25/1969
Application for Writ of Error
F AND C ENGINEERING COMPANY
STATE OF TEXAS AND THE TEXAS HIGHWAY DEPARTMENT
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Remarks Document
07/01/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/05/1969Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/17/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
03/25/1969Appendix FiledPetitioner
03/25/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Remarks Document
07/09/1969Response to Motion filed
07/01/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/05/1969Reply to Response
04/17/1969Response to Petition
03/25/1969Appendix Filed
03/25/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/25/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
F and C Engineering CompanyPetitioner
State of Texas and the Texas Highway DepartmentRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information