judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PETERSON, S.

Case Information: 82-CM-0898
Short Caption:PETERSON, S.Classification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:J1322-82Filed Date:07/01/1982

Opening Event Date:07/01/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/06/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/23/1983
Argued/Submitted:05/02/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Steven H. Leventhal YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PETERSON, S. IN THE MATTER OF:
07/01/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/06/1982FiledRecord Completed
02/23/1983FiledBriefing Completed
05/02/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
08/15/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition