judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MCCLAIN, VICTOR UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0063
Short Caption:MCCLAIN, VICTOR UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Lead:81-CF-0063Consolidated: 81-CF-0075
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5737-79Filed Date:12/02/1980

Opening Event Date:12/02/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/26/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/30/1982
Argued/Submitted:01/12/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Paul K. Regan NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MCCLAIN, VICTOR UNITED STATES
12/02/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/26/1981FiledRecord Completed
09/30/1982FiledBriefing Completed
01/12/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/04/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition