judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NORTH LAS VEGAS VS. PARDEE CONSTRUCTION

Case Information: 30475
Short Caption:NORTH LAS VEGAS VS. PARDEE CONSTRUCTIONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A362605Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/29/1997 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:12/12/2000 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:12/12/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/23/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. Government.
05/23/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
05/29/1997Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Of Settlement Conference. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
06/06/1997Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.
06/09/1997Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
06/12/1997Other Other. Filed certificate of service of docketing statement.
06/16/1997Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Settlement Conference Report. The conference is continued to August 1, 1997.
08/11/1997Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. To appear for second mandatory settlement conference.
05/12/1998Letter/IncomingReceived Letter. From settlement judge Lansford W. Levitt re: progress of settlement negotiations.
12/17/1998Letter/IncomingReceived Letter. From settlement judge Lansford W. Levitt re: status of settlement negotiations.
07/09/1999Other Other. Filed substitution of attorneys.
07/13/1999Other Other. Mailed addtitional documents to settlement judge.
09/10/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Settlement conference report. Settlement judge will keep court informed of settlement status by October 1, 1999.
10/12/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Settlement conference report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
10/29/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 70 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31 (a)(1).
01/03/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Change of address for Harrison, Kemp & Jones law firm.
01/04/2000MotionFiled Motion. To file an opening brief in excess of thirty pages.
01/07/2000BriefReceived Brief. Appellant's opening brief. (Mailed on 1/6/00.)
01/07/2000AppendixReceived Appendix. Joint appendix, Vols. 1 and 2.
01/07/2000MotionFiled Motion. Of Southern Nevada Water Authority for leave to file brief of Amicus Curiae on or before January 25, 2000.
01/07/2000MotionFiled Motion. For leave to file an Amicus Curiae Brief. (Submitted by Las Vegas, Boulder City, and Henderson City Attorneys.)
01/14/2000Other Other. Filed statement of Non-Opposition Re: Motion to file an opening brief in excess of thirty pages.
01/18/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Of Southern Nevada Water Authority for leave to file brief of Amicus Curiae on or before January 25, 2000; and motion for leave to file an Amicus Curiae brief submitted by the City of Las Vegas, the City of Boulder and the City of Henderson.
01/21/2000MotionFiled Motion. For leave of court to file reply to Pardee Construction Company's opposition to motion for leave to file an Amicus Curiae brief. (Reply attached as an exhibit - o.k. to file per S. Jump.)
01/24/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Appellant's unopposed motion filed January 4, 2000, is granted. The clerk shall forthwith file the 34 page opening brief and the joint appendix submitted provisionally on January 7, 2000.
01/24/2000BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's opening brief.
01/24/2000AppendixFiled Appendix. Joint appendix, Vols. 1 and 2.
01/25/2000BriefReceived Brief. Southern Nevada Water Authority's Amicus brief. (Mailed on: Fed-ex 1/24/00.)
02/07/2000MotionFiled Stipulation. Extending time for filing of respondent's answering brief.
02/15/2000BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's answering brief. (Mailed on: Fed-ex 2/14/00.)
02/15/2000AppendixFiled Appendix. Respondent's supplemental appendix, Vols. 1 and 2. (Exhibits to joint appendix filed 1/24/00.)
02/17/2000Other Other. Filed certificate of mailing (Supplemental appendix, Vols. 1 and 2.)
02/17/2000Other Other. Filed certificate of mailing (Respondent's answering brief).
03/10/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. That appellant may have to and including March 30, 2000, within which to file the reply brief.
03/30/2000BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's reply brief. (Mailed on: UPS 3/29/00.)
04/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We grant the motions of Cities and of the Authority to file amicus briefs and to do so subsequent to the filing of appellant's opening brief. We direct the clerk of this court to file forthwith the Authority's amicus brief, which was provisionally submitted on January 25, 2000. The Cities shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve a single amicus brief. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of service of the Cities' amicus brief to file answering briefs, if it so chooses. We deny as moot the cities' motion for leave to file a reply to respondent's opposition. We caution amici curiae that upon reading all of the briefs we will disregard any matters inappropriately included in the amici briefs. Fn1[The answering brief having been filed on February 15, 2000, we disapprove as moot, the parties stipulation filed on February 7, 2000.]
04/05/2000BriefFiled Brief. Southern Nevada Water Authority's Amicus Brief.
04/14/2000BriefFiled Brief. Of the City of Las Vegas, City of Boulder and the City of Henderson as Amicus Curiae.
05/10/2000BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's brief in response to Amicus Curiae briefs.
10/30/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on December 12, 2000 at 10:30 a.m. in Carson City. (NNP00A-MS/DA/ML)
11/27/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
11/28/2000BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. Respondent's Supplemental Authorities. 00-20693
12/12/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Northern Nevada Panel. NNP00A-MS/DA/ML
04/13/2001Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before Shearing, Agosti and Leavitt, JJ. Per Curiam. 117 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 25. NNP00A 01-06383
05/03/2001Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on: May 1, 2001 -LV Drop Box. 01-07426
05/03/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. $100 due on rehearing. Due Date: 10 days
05/04/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. To be served on amicus counsel. Due date: 5 days.
05/09/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing of petition for rehearing to amicus counsel. 01-07731
05/14/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100.00 from Harrison & Kemp-check no. 23072.
03/28/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40 ( c). NNP0A-MS/DA/ML 02-05526
04/12/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-05706
04/12/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/23/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 15, 2002. 02-05706