judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KENT A. KING v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION,

Case Heading (06-252)
Parent: 06-114 Case Docketed On:10/30/2006
Consolidated:06-252
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Motor Vehicles (Title 31)
Short Title:KENT A. KING v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION,
Full Title:KENT A. KING, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKent A. KingRonald G. Pretty
AppelleeDepartment of TransportationPatrick J. Crank
Robin Sessions Cooley
Douglas J. Moench
Dana Jill Lent

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 109
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/03/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, Original Papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/30/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/30/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/30/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/30/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/08/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/11/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/11/2007Correspondence - Incoming from counsel for appellant re due date; advised Monday is holiday, brief will be due the next day.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
01/16/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/05/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
03/06/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/23/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/26/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
04/03/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, one volume: Volume I, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/03/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
06/25/2007Order - Consolidating cases. Case no. 06-252 consolidated with 06-114 for purposes of decision.OrderConsolidating casesFinal
07/12/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/30/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/30/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/02/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for on 8/1/07 by Rosemary Montez.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal