judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

CITY OF DENTON v. ANDREW WHITE

Case: A-194
A-194
05/24/1944
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF DENTON
ANDREW WHITE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/14/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/03/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
05/24/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/05/1955Letter Filed
11/20/1944Response to Motion filed
11/14/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/03/1944Response to Petition
05/24/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
05/24/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of DentonPetitioner
Andrew WhiteRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information