Case Information: 82-CM-0723 | |||
Short Caption: | CUNNINGHAM, ALLEN UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | M851981 | Filed Date: | 05/28/1982 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 05/28/1982 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 12/15/1982 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 04/05/1983 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 06/15/1983 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | CUNNINGHAM, ALLEN UNITED STATES | |||
05/28/1982 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
12/15/1982 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
04/05/1983 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
06/15/1983 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
06/24/1983 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |