Case Information: 37103 | |||
Short Caption: | N & N THUNDER RIDGE VS. DESERT LUMBER CO. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A385872 Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A382538 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Leavitt | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 12/11/2000 / Pomrenze, Sandra | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/05/2000 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Leavitt. Law firm of Leavitt, Sully & Rivers. | ||
12/05/2000 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Leavitt, Sully & Rivers--check no. 6743. | ||
12/05/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. | 00-21183 | |
12/11/2000 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Sandra Pomrenze. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
02/15/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: February 20, 2001. | 01-02988 | |
02/26/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 01-03554 | |
03/13/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellants shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. | 01-04458 | |
03/30/2001 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 01-05575 | |
04/12/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b) SNP/CLK | 01-06321 | |
04/12/2001 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |