Case: 06-97-00198-CR
06-97-00198-CR
10/02/1997
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Barber, Jason Glenn
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/31/1997 | Mandate Issued | | |
10/22/1997 | Opinion issued | Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction | |
10/21/1997 | Holding for Record | | |
10/15/1997 | Received a Response | | |
10/14/1997 | Holding for Record | | |
10/02/1997 | Notice of appeal received | | |
10/02/1997 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
09/26/1997 | Docketing Statement Received | | |
09/22/1997 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/31/1997 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Jason Glenn Barber | Appellant | Melvyn Carson Bruder |
Trial Court Information
115th District Court
Upshur
Honorable Lauren L. Parish
11,753
35 yrs TDCJ + $10,000 Fine