Case Information: 82-CM-0792 | |||
Short Caption: | CARTER, BARKSDALE M. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Theft Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | M6953-81 | Filed Date: | 06/16/1982 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 06/16/1982 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 11/26/1982 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 03/30/1983 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 10/04/1983 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | CARTER, BARKSDALE M. UNITED STATES | |||
06/16/1982 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
11/26/1982 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
03/30/1983 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
10/04/1983 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
10/05/1983 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |