judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, ET AL. v. W. O. HILTON, ET AL.

Case: B-1446
B-1446
03/24/1969
Application for Writ of Error
ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, ET AL.
W. O. HILTON, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Remarks Document
05/22/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/30/1969Response to Reply filedRespondent
04/28/1969Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/04/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
03/24/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Remarks Document
05/27/1969Response to Motion filed
05/22/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/30/1969Response to Reply filed
04/28/1969Reply to Response
04/04/1969Response to Petition
03/24/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/24/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. O. Hilton, et al.Respondent
Atlantic Richfield Company, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information