judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COUNTRY MUTUAL INSURANCE VS. MATHIS

Case Information: 32056
Short Caption:COUNTRY MUTUAL INSURANCE VS. MATHISCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37649
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A352914Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/03/1998 / England, KathleenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/30/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Greg W. Marsh--check no 8168.
03/30/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
03/31/1998Other Other. Filed Certified Copies of Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on 3/27/98.
04/03/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Of Settlement Conference. Settlement Judge: Kathleen J. England. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
04/13/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
04/20/1998MotionFiled Motion. Respondent's Motion to Enlarge Time to File Settlement Brief.
05/05/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On April 20, 1998, respondent filed a motion for an extension of time to submit a settlement statement to the settlement judge. Respondent must seek relief directly from the settlement judge. We deny respondent's motion without prejudice to his right to seek relief directly from the settlement judge.
03/22/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Settlement Conference Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
03/29/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. The time deadlines for requesting and preparing transcripts and briefing shall remain suspended pending a jurisdictional review of this appeal and further order of this court.
04/29/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to comply with NRAP 9(a) and 120 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1).
05/14/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 10/28/97. Court Reporter: Janice Liston.
05/27/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings for October 28, 1997. Court Reporter: Arlene Blazi.
06/17/1999Other Other. Filed Substitution of Attorneys. Salvatore Gugino of Gugino and Schwartz in place and stead of Greg W. Marsh as counsel for appellant.
08/27/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: Airborne Express-no date).
08/27/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Appendix.
10/04/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Respondent may have to and including October 28, 1999, within which to file the answering brief.
11/02/1999MotionFiled Stipulation. To Extend Respondent's time to file Reply to Appellant's Opening Brief. (2nd Request).
11/09/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Granting Extension of Time. Respondent's answering brief shall be served and filed on or before November 29, 1999.
12/17/1999MotionFiled Stipulation. To extend respondent's time to file reply to Appellant's Opening Brief (respondent's answering brief).
01/13/2000MotionFiled Stipulation. To Extend Respondent's time to File Reply to Appellant's Opening Brief. (4th Request).
01/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Respondent shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the answering brief. We do not expect further requests for extensions of time.
02/02/2000Other Other. Returned unfiled Respondent's Answering Brief. Due 10 days.
02/11/2000BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: Fed Ex 2/10/00).
02/11/2000AppendixFiled Appendix. Appendix to Answering Brief.
03/23/2000MotionFiled Stipulation. To Extend Appellant's Time to File Reply to Repondent's Answering Brief (1st Request).
03/24/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The stipulation is treated as an unopposed motion and the motion is granted. Appellant's reply brief shall be served and filed on or before April 20, 2000.
04/20/2000BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: Airborne Express 4/20/00).
07/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. fn1[Pursuant to NRAP 34(f)(1), we have determined that oral argument is not warranted in this appeal.] " . . . we reverse the district court's order granting the motion for additur and increasing the jury's award in favor of respondent to $47,500.02 . . . we remand this matter to the district court to reconsider the motion for additur and for further proceedings consistent with this order." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-12063
08/08/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13765
08/08/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/20/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 1, 2000. 00-13765