judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBERT JAMES HAUCK v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-216)
Case Number:06-216Case Docketed On:09/21/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Certiorari
Short Title:ROBERT JAMES HAUCK v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ROBERT JAMES HAUCK, Petitioner, v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerRobert James HauckMarion Jane Yoder
Diane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
RespondentThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 113
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/21/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/21/2006Petition - Writ - certiorari/reviewPetitionWrit - certiorariFinal
09/21/2006Motion - In forma pauperisMotionIn forma pauperisFinal
10/03/2006Response/Objection - Petition for certiorari/reviewResponse/ObjectionPetition for reviewFinal
10/10/2006Order - Petition for review - grant; and granting in forma pauperisOrderPetition for review - grantFinal
10/23/2006Notice-Incoming - Attorney substitution (Tina Kerin)Notice-IncomingAttorney substitutionFinal
11/21/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of petitionerMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/21/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of petitionerOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/09/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of petitionerMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/11/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of petitionerOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/23/2007Brief - Petitioner; received copy of brief on disk and received copy of designation of recordBriefPetitionerFinal
03/07/2007Brief - Respondent; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of recordBriefRespondentFinal
03/19/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/29/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, five volumes: Volumes I and II, original papers; Vollume III, transcripts; Volume IV, confidential file; Volume V, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
04/23/2007Order - Other - Emergency order allowing four justices to hear oral argument (Justice Golden ill).OrderOtherFinal
04/24/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Hill, Kite and Burke (Tina N. Kerin, Post-Conviction Counsel for petitioner; David L. Delicath, Senior Assistant Attorney General for respondent) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/24/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/18/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part, reversing in part, and remanding.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/03/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/03/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/03/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/07/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 8/6/07 by Michelle Crotteau.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal