judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EDMONDS, DONALD L. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0075
Short Caption:EDMONDS, DONALD L. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Lead: 81-CF-0063 Consolidated:81-CF-0075
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7063-79Filed Date:12/15/1980

Opening Event Date:12/15/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/26/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/30/1982
Argued/Submitted:01/12/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Sebastian K. Graber NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901EDMONDS, DONALD L. UNITED STATES
12/15/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/26/1981FiledRecord Completed
09/30/1982FiledBriefing Completed
01/12/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/04/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition