Case Information: 37113 | |||
Short Caption: | RAICHLE (JOHN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 36915 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C168543 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/06/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/06/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 00-21285 | |
01/18/2001 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 01-01099 | |
01/18/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 01-01100 | |
01/18/2001 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 01-01102 | |
02/06/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 01-02366 | |
02/06/2001 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 01-02368 | |
03/05/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB | 01-03933 | |
03/23/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On March 5, 2001, this court entered an order dismissing this appeal. On March 2, 2001, this court received a proper person "Request for Submission of motion." The motions identified by appellant appear to be post-conviction motions that are not the subject of this appeal. Moreover, to the extent that the motions are relevant to this appeal, appellant is represented by counsel and has not been granted permission to file documents in this matter in proper person. Under the circumstances, the clerk of this court shall return, unfiled the proper person "Request for Submission of Motion." | 01-05165 | |
03/23/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. to appellant John Anthony Raichle: returned unfiled, the original proper person Request for Submission of Motion received on March 2, 2001. | ||
04/02/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-04099 | |
04/02/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/13/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 6, 2001. | 01-04099 |