Case: B-6817
B-6817
06/07/1977
Application for Writ of Error
VICTOR MORAN, JR., ET AL.
LESTER ADLER
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/10/1978 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
02/02/1978 | Supplemental Brief filed | Respondent | | |
06/22/1977 | Response to Petition | Petitioner | | |
06/07/1977 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Respondent | | |
06/07/1977 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/21/1978 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
08/10/1978 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
07/26/1978 | Opinion issued | | ||
02/02/1978 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
11/16/1977 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/16/1977 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/16/1977 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/16/1977 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/16/1977 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
06/22/1977 | Response to Petition | | ||
06/07/1977 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
06/07/1977 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
06/07/1977 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Victor Moran, Jr., et al. | Petitioner | |
Lester Adler | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information