Case Information: 35446 | |||
Short Caption: | HENDERSON (WILLIE) VS. DIRECTOR | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 9901035H | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/06/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/06/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). | 00-00227 | |
01/07/2000 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 00-00255 | |
01/21/2000 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 00-00994 | |
05/08/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: June 7, 2000. | 00-07520 | |
06/07/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Representation of Respondent. | 00-09644 | |
06/07/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Second Motion to Extend Time in Which to File Appellant's Opening Brief. | 00-09646 | |
06/09/2000 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. The appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before July 7, 2000. | 00-09771 | |
07/07/2000 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 7/7/00. | 00-11632 | |
07/07/2000 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. | 00-11633 | |
08/02/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: September 6, 2000. | 00-13398 | |
09/06/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss as Moot. | 00-15697 | |
09/08/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Attach (Affidavit). | 00-15895 | |
09/19/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Enlarge Time in which to File Appellant's Response to Motion to Dismiss. | 00-16560 | |
09/22/2000 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. The response to motion to dismiss provisionally submitted on September 19, 2000, shall be filed, forthwith. | 00-16783 | |
09/22/2000 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. | 00-16554 | |
11/17/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "We grant the State's motion to dismiss the appeal and we ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML | 00-20183 | |
12/13/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-20276 | |
12/13/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/22/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 14, 2000. | 00-20276 |