judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RUIZ VS. R & R CONCRETE

Case Information: 31636
Short Caption:RUIZ VS. R & R CONCRETECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A341530Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:02/18/1998 / Lavelle, EleissaSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:05/09/2000 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:05/09/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/05/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 (Jeffrey R. Albregts-check no. 6494).
01/05/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
01/12/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 (Jolley Urga firm-check no. 505264).
01/12/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant-Jolley firm.)
01/14/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due date: 10 days.
01/14/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Notice of Settlement Conference. Settlement Judge: Phillip Aurbach. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/22/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (R & R Concrete).
01/26/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (Ruiz).
02/05/1998Letter/IncomingReceived Letter. Letter from Settlement Judge Phillip Aurbach. Due to a conflict of interest, he is returning the settlement documents.
02/06/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Filed certified copy of Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on December 23, 1997.
02/17/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Filed Certified Copy of Second Amended Notice of Appeal.
02/18/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Issued Amended Notice of Settlement Conference. New Settlement Judge: Eleissa Lavelle. (Settlement conference materials forwarded to Judge Lavelle.)
08/20/1998Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Settlement Conference Report: the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
09/25/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellant and cross-appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal and cross-appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The briefing schedule and preparation of transcripts in this appeal and cross-appeal shall remain suspended pending further order of this court.
10/20/1998MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Response to Order to Show Cause and Points and Authorities in Support of This Court's Jurisdiction of Their Appeal.
10/21/1998MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause and Points and Authorities in Support of Her Motion to Dismiss Appeal.
11/02/1998MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellants/Cross-Respondents' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal.
02/25/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We conclude that this court has jurisdiction to consider the appeal and cross-appeal. fn1[The appellant in this appeal and cross-appeal is deemed to be Ms. Ruiz, because she was plaintiff below.] The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(a) and 120 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1).
03/12/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts of Proceedings for April 3-4, 1997. Court Reporter: Danelle Reddy.
03/18/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Transcripts of Proceedings for April 3, 1997 and April 4, 1997. Court Reporter: Danelle Reddy.
06/24/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: Fed-Ex 6/23/99).
06/24/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Appendix, Vols. 1 and 2.
10/06/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Respondents shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file and serve the combined brief or show cause why their failure to file an answering brief should not be treated as a confession of error and their failure to file an opening brief on cross-appeal should not result in the dismissal of their cross-appeal as abandoned.
10/22/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Appearance. Corby D. Arnold in place and stead of Jeffrey R. Albregts & Associates as counsel for respondents/cross-appellants.
10/22/1999BriefFiled Brief. Cross Appellant's Opening Brief and Respondent's Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 10/21/99.
10/22/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Respondents'/Cross Appellants' Appendix.
11/18/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: Fed Ex 11/17/99.)
11/19/1999Other Other. Filed Certificate of Mailing. (Appellant's Reply Brief).
03/27/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for May 9, 2000 at the hour of 10:30 a.m. for 1/2 hour in Las Vegas.(SNP99B-WM/MS/NB) 00-05003
04/24/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 00-06418
05/09/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB
08/10/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. " . . . we reverse that portion of the district court's judgment which fails to award to Ruiz the value of the Rhodes Concrete account and determination that there are no damages attributable to the breach of fiduciary duty cause of action and remand this case to the district court for the purpose of recalculating the breach of fiduciary duty and dissolution damages, as well as the prejudgment interest in accordance with this order . . . the district court's judgment is affirmed in all other respects." fn6[We have considered the remaining assertions of error in the appeal and cross-appeal and find them to the without merit.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-13980
09/05/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14105
09/05/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. 00-14105