judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-2983
A-2983
01/03/1951
Application for Writ of Error
MRS. OLGA SCHILLER
J. J. ELICK
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/16/1951Reply to ResponseRespondent
06/23/1951Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
06/07/1951Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/21/1951Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
03/21/1951Response to Brief filedPetitioner
03/21/1951Brief on the MeritsRespondent
01/27/1951Response to Brief filedRespondent
01/24/1951Reply to ResponsePetitioner
01/13/1951Response to PetitionRespondent
01/03/1951Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/16/1951Reply to Response
06/29/1951Response to Motion filed
06/23/1951Brief in Support of Petition
06/07/1951Motion for Rehearing
05/23/1951Opinion issued
03/21/1951Supplemental Brief filed
03/21/1951Response to Brief filed
03/21/1951Brief on the Merits
02/21/1951Document received (See Remarks)
01/27/1951Response to Brief filed
01/24/1951Reply to Response
01/13/1951Response to Petition
01/03/1951Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/03/1951Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mrs. Olga SchillerPetitioner
J. J. ElickRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information