judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PATTERSON (MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32018
Short Caption:PATTERSON (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 26844BClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/24/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/23/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/23/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to all counsel.)
03/31/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings: 3/11/92, 3/12/92, 3/13/92, and 2/12/98. Court reporter: Joan Wilder.
04/23/1998Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Clerk's Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Pursuant to the telephonic request of April 22, 1998, appellant shall have to and including April 27, 1998, to serve and file the fast track statement.
04/27/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Appellant's Fast Track Statement.
04/28/1998Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Clerk's Order Granting the motion filed April 27, 1998. Appellant shall have until May 11, 1998, to file the fast track statement.
05/12/1998Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.
06/01/1998Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.
06/01/1998AppendixFiled Appendix. Respondent's Appendix, Vols. 1 through 3.
08/13/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief and appendix due: 40 days after the date of this order. The answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. Fn2[We hereby suspend the requirement in NRAP 9 for counsel to file a certified transcript in this appeal].
09/23/1999MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Appellant may have to and including October 22, 1999, within which to file the opening brief.
10/22/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Second Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief.
10/27/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before November 22, 1999.
11/22/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief.
12/21/1999MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Respondent may have to and including January 24, 2000, to file the answering brief.
01/24/2000BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: Reno/Carson 1/24/00.)
01/24/2000AppendixFiled Appendix. Respondent's Appendix, Vols. 1 through 4.
01/25/2000Other Other. Filed Certificate of Service for Appendix to Answering Brief.
02/23/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Appellant shall have to and including March 24, 2000, to file the Reply Brief.
04/18/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On March 24, 2000, counsel for appellant informed the clerk of this court that his office had been burglarized and that he lacked the capacity to file the reply brief or a motion for an extension of time on that day. He noted he would be filing a motion for extension of time at the earliest opportunity. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file a reply brief. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner will be considered a waiver of the right to file a reply brief.
05/24/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's failure to file a reply brief is treated as a waiver of the right to file a reply brief. Briefing is completed in this appeal.
05/24/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/20/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered Patterson's arguments and concluded they lack merit, "we affirm the denial of his petition for a writ of habeas corpus." -NNP00A-MS/DA/ML. 00-22198
01/16/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-22581
01/16/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/20/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 23, 2001. 00-22581