judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FREDRICK CHARLES WILKENING v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-109)
Case Number:06-109Case Docketed On:05/18/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Certiorari
Short Title:FREDRICK CHARLES WILKENING v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:FREDRICK CHARLES WILKENING, Petitioner/Appellant, v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Respondent/Appellee.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerFredrick Charles WilkeningD. Terry Rogers
Tina N. Olson
RespondentThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Eric Alan Johnson
Geoffrey Gunnerson
Kevin Kessner

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 187
Citation:172 P.3d 385

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/18/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/18/2006Petition - Writ - review or in the alternative, petiiton for writ of certiorariPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
05/18/2006Motion - In forma pauperisMotionIn forma pauperisFinal
06/06/2006Order - Petition for review - grant, in part. Remanded to district court for hearing to be held within 60 days.OrderPetition for review - grantFinal
08/07/2006Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Findings of fact and conclusions of law after remand hearing.Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesFindings of fact and conclusions of lawFinal
08/09/2006Notice-Incoming - Other; received copy of transcript of remand from the Court Reporter.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
08/22/2006Order - Petition for review - grant; restored direct appeal. Case caption amended.OrderPetition for review - grantFinal
10/06/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/10/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/21/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/21/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/08/2007Brief - Petitioner (Appellant); received copy of designation of record and brief on disk.BriefPetitionerFinal
02/21/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/22/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/05/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/06/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/24/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
05/24/2007Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval (Kevin Kessner, law student, to appear on behalf of the Appellee)Notice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
06/11/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/27/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes. Volumes I & II, original papers, Volume III, transcripts; Volume IV, exhibit.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/27/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
07/06/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/11/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina KerinNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting. Kevin Kessner will present argument on behalf of appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/14/2007Event - Oral argument presented before full Court, Tina N. Kerin, Appellate Counsel for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General, Eric Alan Johnson, Director, Prosecution Assistance Program, Kevin Kessner, Student Intern, for the Appellee, argument by Mr. Kessner and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
08/14/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/30/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal orderOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/19/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/19/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/28/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal