Case Information: 38969 | |||
Short Caption: | SCOTT VS. GRIGAS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A436880 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/21/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/21/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 01-21589 | |
02/08/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. We"ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP02--CY/DA/ML | 02-02610 | |
03/26/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Answer to Rehearing Petition. On February 27, 2002, appellant submitted a petition for rehearing. fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, see NRAP 46(b), we have considered the proper person documents received from him.] Respondents shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file an answer, including authorities, to the petition for rehearing. | 02-05348 | |
04/10/2002 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Answer to Petition for Rehearing. | 02-06334 | |
05/06/2002 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[See NRAP 40 ( c). Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, see NRAP 46(b), we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML | 02-07890 | |
05/21/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-07991 | |
05/21/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/17/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 24, 2002. | 02-07991 |