Case Information: 38972 | |||
Short Caption: | JACKSON VS. CITY OF NORTH LAS VEGAS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 30995 , 43367 , 44231 , 44457 , 44876 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A366925 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/21/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/21/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 01-21597 | |
01/17/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB | 02-01229 | |
02/21/2002 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NNP02-MS/RR/NB | 02-03313 | |
03/08/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-03430 | |
03/08/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/01/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 21, 2002. | 02-03430 |