judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-3003
A-3003
01/08/1951
Application for Writ of Error
PROVIDENCE WASHINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
O. C. PROFFITT, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/22/1951Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
05/10/1951Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/06/1951Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/23/1951Response to PetitionRespondent
01/08/1951Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/22/1951Brief in Support of Petition
05/10/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/25/1951Dissenting opinion issued.
04/25/1951Opinion issued
03/06/1951Reply to Response
02/23/1951Response to Petition
02/07/1951Document received (See Remarks)
01/18/1951Document received (See Remarks)
01/08/1951Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
O. C. Proffitt, et al.Respondent
Providence Washington Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information