judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CARUSO VS. HENDERSON ASSOCIATES C/W 31159

Case Information: 31316
Short Caption:CARUSO VS. HENDERSON ASSOCIATES C/W 31159Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 31159 *, 31316Related Case(s): 31159
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A352491Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:05/08/2000 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:05/08/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/07/1997Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Bret Caruso (USP M.O. 67289347530).
11/07/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
11/04/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Filed Order the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. The appellants and cross-appellants shall have 15 days from the date of this order to fully comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(a), if necessary. Appellants shall have 140 days from the order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a). We direct the clerk to amend the caption on Docket No. 31159 so that it is consistent with the caption on this order. Docket No. 31316 arises from the same district court case as Docket No. 31159 and appears to be an appeal from an order granting attorney fees. It is therefore ordered that the two cases are now consolidated for all appellate purposes. Bret Caruso is instructed to address the issues raised in both appeals in his opening brief. (Docket sheet and case cards amended in docket No. 31159.) Nos. 33159, 31316
03/26/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: 3/24/99). (Nos. 31159 and 31316).
03/26/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Appendix, Vols. 1 and 2. (Nos. 31159 and 31316).
04/21/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Respondent/Cross Appellant Acumen Corp. shall have to and including May 26, 1999, to file the Answering Brief (Nos. 31159 & 31316).
04/23/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's (Henderson Associates, Consolidated Management, Inc. and Eli Applebaum) Answering Brief. (Mailed on: 4/21/99) (Nos. 31159 and 31316).
05/14/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Extension of Time to File Trylone's Reply Brief and Mario and Lisa Caruso's Answering Brief in No. 31159. (Nos. 31159, 31316).
05/26/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for extension of time to file Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Acumen Corporation's Opening and Answering Brief (Nos. 31159 & 31316)
06/04/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Partial Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to File Acumen's Answering Brief (nos. 31159/31316).
06/28/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Order Extending Time to File Appellant's Opening and Answering Brief. Nos. 31159 and 31316.
07/15/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Order Extending Time to File Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Opening and Answering Brief (Nos. 31159 and 31316).
07/15/1999BriefReceived Brief. Received Respondent/Cross-Appellant Acumen Corporation and Donald Zeiter's Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. (No.s 31159 & 31316)
07/15/1999AppendixReceived Appendix. Received Respondent/Cross-Appellant Acumen Corporation and Donald Zeiter's Appendix (no.s 31159 & 31316).
07/16/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The motion filed July 15, 1999, is granted. The answering brief and opening brief on cross-appeal and appendix provisionally submitted on July 15, 1999, shall be filed, forthwith (nos. 31159 & 31316).
07/16/1999BriefFiled Brief. Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Acumen Corporation and Donald Zeiter's Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal ( Nos. 31159 & 31316)
07/16/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Acumen Corporation and Donald Zeiter's Appendix (Nos. 31159 and 31316).
08/16/1999BriefFiled Brief. Filed Cross-Respondents Mario and Lisa caruso's Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal (Mailed on: 8/13/99) (Nos. 31159 & 31316).
08/16/1999BriefFiled Brief. Filed Appellant's (Trylone Limited and Bret Caruso) Reply Brief. (Mailed on: 8/13/99) (Nos. 31159 and 31316).
09/17/1999MotionFiled Stipulation. Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Respondents/Cross-Appellants Henderson Associates, Consolidated Management, Inc. and Eli Appelbaum's Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. (Nos. 31159 & 31316).
09/28/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for order extending time to file Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Reply Brief. (nos. 31159 & 31316).
09/28/1999MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation for extension of time to file Respondent/Cross-Appellant Acumen and Donald Zeiter's Reply Brief. (Nos. 31159 and 31316).
09/28/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Filed Order on July 16, 1999, Acumen Corporation and Zeiter filed a brief in docket No. 31159. Accordingly, the pending motions for extensions of time filed by Acumen and Zeiter on May 26, 1999, and June 28, 1999, are denied as moot. On August 16, 1999, cross-respondents Caruso filed an answering brief. Accordingly, the pending motion for an extension of time filed on May 14, 1999, is denied as moot. On August 16, appellants filed a single reply brief. Accordingly, we deny as moot appellants' motion filed May 14, 1999, for leave to file a single reply brief. On September 17, 1999, Henderson, Consolidated and Applebaum filed a stipulation on No. 31159 to extend time to file a reply brief on cross-appeal. However, only Henderson filed a notice of cross-appeal. We approve the stipulation in part. Henderson shall have until October 18, 1999, to file the reply brief on cross-appeal. Acumen and Zeiter shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a reply brief in their cross-appeal in No. 31159. Upon filing of this brief, briefing should be completed in these appeals. (Nos. 31159 & 31316).
10/14/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Henderson Associates, Consolidate Management, Inc., and Eli Applebaum's Reply Brief for Cross-Appeal. (Mailed on: No postmark). (Nos. 31159 and 31316).
11/02/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent/Cross-Appellant Acumen Corp. and Donald Zeiter's Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. (Mailed on: 10/28/99) (Nos. 31159 & 31316).
03/27/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for May 8, 2000 at the hour of 11:30 a.m. for 1/2 hour in Las Vegas.(Nos. 31159 and 31316) (SNP99B-WM/MS/NB) 00-04889
04/24/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 00-06422
05/08/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB Nos. 31159, 31316.
08/10/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. " . . . we hereby order that these appeals be dismissed with the exception of the award of attorney's fees to Acumen . . . we further order that this matter be remanded for further proceedings to determine the appropriate amount of fees expended by Acumen with respect to the actions upon which it prevailed below." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB. Nos. 31159, 31316. Document No. 00-13971.
08/30/2000Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. L.V. drop box 8/28/00 (nos. 31316/31159).
08/30/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Richard McKnight-check no. 20123 (nos. 31316/31159).
11/06/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[We direct the clerk of this court to amend the caption on this court's docket in No. 31316 so that it is consistent with the caption on this order.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB. Nos. 31159, 31316. 00-19506
11/22/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-19629
11/22/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/22/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 28, 2000. 00-19629