judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOSE RAMIREZ v. ELVIN BROWN, BILL WARTENBEE and BRYCE MITCHELL

Case Heading (S-19-0219)
Case Number:S-19-0219Case Docketed On:09/30/2019
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:JOSE RAMIREZ v. ELVIN BROWN, BILL WARTENBEE and BRYCE MITCHELL
Full Title:JOSE RAMIREZ, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. ELVIN BROWN, BILL WARTENBEE and BRYCE MITCHELL, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJose RamirezC. John Cotton
AppelleeElvin BrownRyan C. Gill
John A. Masterson
Katharine Whitney Allen
AppelleeBill WartenbeeRyan C. Gill
John A. Masterson
Katharine Whitney Allen
AppelleeBryce MitchellRyan C. Gill
John A. Masterson
Katharine Whitney Allen

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Negligence, Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2020 WY 79
Citation:466 P.3d 285

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/30/2019Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/30/2019Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/30/2019Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/30/2019Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/30/2019Notice-Outgoing - E-filing requirement sent to R. GillNotice-OutgoingE-filing requirementFinal
11/08/2019Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/12/2019Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/17/2019Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/20/2019Event - Hardcopy received - Stipulated Motion for Extension of TimeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/20/2019Order Granting Appellee's Request for Extension to File BriefOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/03/2020Brief - Appellee (appendix docs adopted from Appellant's brief, to avoid duplication)BriefAppelleeFinal
01/06/2020Notice-Outgoing - Notice of case maturityNotice-OutgoingNotice of case maturityFinal
01/06/2020Notice-Incoming - Appellee's Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
01/08/2020Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/13/2020Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/13/2020Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/14/2020Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/14/2020Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/22/2020Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/22/2020Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes 1-3 - Original papers; Volume 4 - Transcripts (2 total)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/22/2020Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/28/2020Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Ryan C. Gill obo AppelleesNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/29/2020Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting received by John Masterson obo appellee (will not argue)Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/29/2020Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting received by Katharine W. Allen obo appellee (will not argue)Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/07/2020Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from C. John Cotton obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/12/2020Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before Chief Justice Davis, Justices Fox, Kautz, Boomgaarden and Gray (C. John Cotton o/b/o Appellant; Ryan C. Gill, Katharine W. Allen, John A. Masterson, argument by Mr. Gill o/b/o Appellees) and taken under advisementNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/19/2020Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part with Justice Boomgaarden writing for the Court. Justice Fox files a dissenting opinion in which Justice Kautz joins.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/07/2020Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/07/2020Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/07/2020Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/07/2020Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/13/2020Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/8/20 by Anne VolinServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal