judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SLAN, JOSEPH GROSS, ALAN

Case Information: 85-CV-1120
Short Caption:SLAN, JOSEPH GROSS, ALANClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA4609-84Filed Date:08/16/1985

Opening Event Date:08/16/1985Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/03/1985Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/07/1986
Argued/Submitted:06/04/1986
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAllan G. Slan NPro SeN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Karen L. Federman YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Lorin H. Bleecker NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Joseph Sperling YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SLAN, JOSEPH GROSS, ALAN ET AL
08/16/1985FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/03/1985FiledRecord Completed
02/07/1986FiledBriefing Completed
06/04/1986FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/11/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition