judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

POTOMAC ELECTRIC POWER COMPANYPUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION OF

Case Information: 81-AA-0305
Short Caption:POTOMAC ELECTRIC POWER COMPANYPUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION OFClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Public Service Commission
Lead: 81-AA-0302 Consolidated: 81-AA-0303 , 81-AA-0305
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:03/13/1981

Opening Event Date:03/13/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/13/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/17/1981
Argued/Submitted:09/01/1981
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901POTOMAC ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
03/13/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/13/1981FiledRecord Completed
07/17/1981FiledBriefing Completed
09/01/1981FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/30/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition