judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SUSAN K. KRUCKENBERG and LINDA LEIF v. DING MASTERS, INC.

Case Heading (S-07-0084)
Case Number:S-07-0084Case Docketed On:04/16/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Insurance Code (Title 26)
Short Title:SUSAN K. KRUCKENBERG and LINDA LEIF v. DING MASTERS, INC.
Full Title:SUSAN K. KRUCKENBERG and LINDA LEIF, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. DING MASTERS, INC., Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSusan K. KruckenbergRonald G. Pretty
AppellantLinda LeifRonald G. Pretty
AppelleeDing Masters, Inc.Robert Carl Jarosh
Richard Grant Schneebeck

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Jurisdiction - Appellate, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 40
Citation:180 P.3d 895

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/16/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/16/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/31/2007Motion - Other - Motion to amend caption and motion to supplement notice of appealMotionOtherFinal
05/31/2007Brief - Appellant and received designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
06/07/2007Response/Objection - Motion. Ding Master, Inc.'s response to motion to amend caption and motion to supplement notice of appeal and Ding Masters, Inc.'s motion to dismiss.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
06/07/2007Memorandum - Other. Memorandum of points and authorities in support of Ding Masters, Inc.'s response to motion to amend caption and motion to supplement notice of appeal and memorandum of points and authorities in support of Ding Masters, Inc.'s motion to dismiss.MemorandumOtherFinal
06/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Other - supplement to motion to amend captionNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/27/2007Order - Amending caption. Order granting motion to amend caption, order denying motion to supplement notice of appeal, and order denying motion to dismiss appeal.OrderAmending captionFinal
07/17/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
07/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Request to place on expedited docketNotice-IncomingRequest to place on brief only docketFinal
07/30/2007Notice-Incoming - Other. Appellant's request for oral argument.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
07/30/2007Brief - Appellant reply; and received copy of brief on cd.BriefAppellant replyFinal
07/31/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/10/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Original Papers Doc. 164-899RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/10/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
08/14/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, Robert C. Jarosh on behalf of appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Ron Pretty for appellantsNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/28/2007Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
08/29/2007Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
10/10/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Robert C. Jarosh on behalf of Appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Ronald G. PrettyNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Ron Pretty for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/15/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Ronald G. Pretty for appellant; Robert Carl Jarosh for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/15/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/07/2008Notice-Incoming - Additional authority from counsel for appellantsNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
04/08/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/21/2008Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
05/07/2008Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
05/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/07/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/07/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/13/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 5/12/08.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal