Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/24/1996 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | |
12/30/1996 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | | |
12/30/1996 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Notice of entry of amended judgment filed 11/6/96. Due Date: 10 days | | |
01/08/1997 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100.00 from Patrick C. Clary, Check No. 1435. | | |
01/08/1997 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. To Court Reporter: Alice Eastgate. | | |
01/13/1997 | Other | Other. Filed Proof of Service. Request for Transcript of Proceedings filed 1/8/97. | | |
01/16/1997 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | |
02/04/1997 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | |
02/07/1997 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. Granting Motion filed February 4, 1997. The court reporter shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the transcripts requested in this matter. | | |
02/10/1997 | Other | Other. Filed Affidavit of Alice F. Eastgate, Court Reporter. (This affidavit informs court that 2/4/97 motion contained "incorrect statements." No action required.ah) | | |
02/13/1997 | Other | Other. Filed Affidavit of Alice F. Eastgate, Court Reporter. (Corrects statement in affidavit filed 2/10/97. No action required.ah) | | |
02/18/1997 | Other | Other. Filed Supplemental Request for Transcript of Proceedings. | | |
03/03/1997 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. (4) - August 10, 11, and 12, 1995; August 11, 1995; August 12, 1995; October 26, 1995. | | |
04/22/1997 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Appellant shall have to and including May 12, 1997, to file the Opening Brief. | | |
05/19/1997 | Other | Other. Filed Substitution of Attorneys: Dempsey, Roberts & Smith in lieu of Patrick C. Clary, Chartered, and Herbert Sachs in Proper Person, respectively. | | |
05/19/1997 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | |
05/21/1997 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. Granting the motion filed May 19, 1997. The opening brief shall be served and filed on or before June 11, 1997. | | |
06/09/1997 | Motion | Filed Motion. Further Extension of Time to file Opening Brief. | | |
06/12/1997 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. Granting Motion filed June 9, 1997. The opening brief shall be served and filed on or before July 11, 1997. | | |
07/11/1997 | Brief | Filed Brief. Appellants' Opening Brief. (Mailed on 7/10/97) | | |
07/11/1997 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. To Appellants' Opening Brief, Vols. 1 through 4. | | |
08/06/1997 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Respondent shall have to and including September 10, 1997, to file the Answering Brief. | | |
09/12/1997 | Brief | Filed Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: 9/10/97) | | |
09/12/1997 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Respondent's Appendix. (Mailed on: 9/10/97) | | |
10/08/1997 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Appellant may have to and including November 13, 1997, to file the reply brief. | | |
11/12/1997 | Motion | Filed Motion. For Further Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. | | |
11/14/1997 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. Granting the motion filed November 12, 1997. The reply brief shall be served and filed on or before December 15, 1997. | | |
12/15/1997 | Brief | Filed Brief. Appellants' Reply Brief. (Mailed on: 12/12/97) | | |
06/26/1998 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. To Withdraw Appeal. | | |
07/23/1998 | Other | Other. Received from counsel for respondents: a copy of the Notice of Imposition of Automatic Stay Under Bankruptcy Code (Patrick C. Clary) and the Notice of Imposition Automatic Stay Under Bankruptcy Code (Patrick C. Clary). | | |
10/19/1998 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Imposition of Automatic Stay under Bankruptcy Code. | | |
11/09/1998 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Caption changed to reflect dismissal. The parties have stipulated to dismiss this appeal as to appellant Herbert Sachs. We approve the stipulation and direct the clerk to remove appellant Herbert Sachs' name from the caption on the court's docket in this matter. We hereby stay all further proceedings in this appeal pending the lifting of the bankruptcy stay or entry of a final determination in the bankruptcy proceedings. Appellant's counsel, Patrick C. Clary, shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file a report informing this court of the status of the bankruptcy proceedings. (Appellant Herbert Sachs' name removed from the caption.) | | |
03/31/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. Appellants' counsel shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file a report informing this court of the status of the bankruptcy proceedings. | | |
04/15/1999 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Filed Notice of Change of Attorney. Appellant Patrick C. Clary hereby substitutes as his attorney Douglas H. Clark for and in lieu of Dempsey, Roberts & Smith. | | |
04/15/1999 | Other | Other. Filed Report on Chapter 11 Case. | | |
05/05/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. To file status report. Appellants shall file with this court an additional status report within 60 days of the date of this order. | | |
07/19/1999 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Address correction or change. | | |
07/19/1999 | Other | Other. Filed Status Report. | | |
08/11/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. To file status report. Appellants shall file with this court an additional status report within 60 days of the date of this order. | | |
10/27/1999 | Other | Other. Filed Status Report. | | |
12/13/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. to file status report. Appellants shall file with this court an additional status report within 60 days of the date of this court. | | |
03/17/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. To file status report. Appellants shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file with this court an additional status report. Failure to comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions on appellants' counsel, including, but not limited to, the imposition of monetary sanctions. | | |
04/03/2000 | Other | Other. Filed Status Report. | | |
04/25/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. To file status report. Appellants shall file with this court an additional status report within 60 days of the date of this order. The report shall indicate whether this matter continues to be stayed pursuant to the automatic bankruptcy stay mandated by 11 U.S.C. ยง362(a). | | |
09/06/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Status Report. Status report due from appellants: 15 days from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions on appellants' counsel, including, but not limited to, the imposition of monetary sanctions. | | 00-15647 |
10/04/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Status Report. | | 00-17599 |
12/26/2000 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal. | | 00-22401 |
12/29/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On December 26, 2000, the parties filed a stipulation to dismiss the appeal. We disapprove the stipulation without prejudice to the refiling of such a stipulation upon resolution of the bankruptcy proceedings or a lifting of the automatic stay. Counsel for appellant shall file a report on the status of the bankruptcy proceedings within 30 days from the date of this order. | | 00-22736 |
02/02/2001 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from Michele Touby LoBello informing the Court that Terry Coffing is the attorney for respondents. | | 01-02218 |
02/06/2001 | Other | Other. Filed Report on Chapter 11 Case. | | 01-02372 |
07/03/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On February 6, 2001, appellant Patrick C. Clary filed a status report informing this court that the bankruptcy proceeding had been dismissed. Accordingly, this appeal is no longer stayed. This appeal shall be reviewed as this court's docket permits. | | 01-11186 |
07/26/2001 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | | 01-12708 |
11/13/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and, cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NRAP 42(b) SNP/CLK | | 01-18810 |
11/13/2001 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. | | |