judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

LULING OIL AND GAS COMPANY v. HUMBLE OIL AND REFINING COMPANY

Case: A-576
A-576
05/31/1944
Application for Writ of Error
LULING OIL AND GAS COMPANY
HUMBLE OIL AND REFINING COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/12/1946Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/15/1945Reply to ResponsePetitioner
10/02/1945Reply to ResponseRespondent
08/28/1945Response to Brief filedPetitioner
08/06/1945Brief on the MeritsRespondent
06/20/1945Reply to ResponsePetitioner
06/11/1945Reply to ResponsePetitioner
06/04/1945Response to PetitionRespondent
05/15/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/18/1946Letter Filed
01/12/1946Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/15/1945Reply to Response
10/02/1945Reply to Response
08/28/1945Response to Brief filed
08/06/1945Brief on the Merits
07/11/1945Letter Filed
06/26/1945Bond
06/20/1945Reply to Response
06/20/1945Opinion issued
06/20/1945Document received (See Remarks)
06/20/1945Document received (See Remarks)
06/20/1945Document received (See Remarks)
06/20/1945Document received (See Remarks)
06/20/1945Document received (See Remarks)
06/20/1945Document received (See Remarks)
06/11/1945Reply to Response
06/04/1945Response to Petition
05/24/1945Additional Copies receivedFiling granted
05/18/1945Letter Filed
05/15/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/31/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Humble Oil and Refining CompanyRespondent
Luling Oil and Gas CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information