Case Heading (S-18-0003) | |||||
Case Number: | S-18-0003 | Case Docketed On: | 01/02/2018 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Sixth Judicial District Campbell County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27) | ||
Short Title: | IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: LINDA J. HARBORTH v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., DEPARTMENT OF WORKFORCE SERVICES, WORKERS' COMPENSATION DIVISION | ||||
Full Title: | IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: LINDA J. HARBORTH, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., DEPARTMENT OF WORKFORCE SERVICES, WORKERS' COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Linda J. Harborth | C. John Cotton |
Appellee | Department of Workforce Services - Workers' Safety and Compensation Division | Peter K. Michael Daniel E. White Michael J. Finn James Clarence Demers Kelly Mullen Donoho |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Workers' Compensation |
Opinion Number: | 2018 WY 88 |
Citation: | 424 P.3d 1261 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
01/02/2018 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
01/02/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
01/02/2018 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
01/02/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
01/04/2018 | Notice-Incoming - District Court Pleading - Notice of Substitution of Counsel (Finn) | Notice-Incoming | District Court Pleading | Final | |
02/16/2018 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
02/21/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/02/2018 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
04/02/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/13/2018 | Notice-Internal - Brief only recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
04/17/2018 | Notice-Internal - Veto | Notice-Internal | Veto | Final | |
04/17/2018 | Brief - Appellant reply | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
04/18/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
04/19/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/25/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record transmittal notice from district court | Final | |
04/25/2018 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume 1 - Original pleadings; Volume 2 - Agency record (contains 4 volumes of redacted and unredacted pleadings) | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
04/25/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
05/02/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance | Notice-Incoming | Entry of appearance | Final | |
05/03/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of Appearance (Mullen) | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
05/03/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Appellee's Amended Designation of record | Notice-Incoming | Designation of record | Final | |
05/08/2018 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
05/10/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting received by Kelly Mullen obo appellee. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
05/16/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting received by C. John Cotton obo appellant | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
06/12/2018 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before Chief Justice Burke, Justices Davis, Fox, Kautz and Boomgaarden (C. John Cotton o/b/o Appellant; Kelly D. Mullen o/b/o Appellee) and taken under advisement | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
08/22/2018 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order, affirming with Justice Fox writing for the Court. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
09/07/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
09/07/2018 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
09/07/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
09/07/2018 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
09/13/2018 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/11/2018 by Pam Merchen | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |