Case: 05-00-01044-CV
05-00-01044-CV
07/06/2000
Miscellaneous civil
McKinney Independent School District
Carlisle Grace, LTD and Gordon M. Griffin, Jr. Revocable Trust
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/09/2015 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
12/04/2002 | Case stored | | |||
12/03/2002 | Mandate Issued | | |||
12/03/2002 | Mandate Issued | | |||
09/16/2002 | Opinion to Publishers | | |||
09/12/2002 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
07/18/2002 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
07/15/2002 | 10.00 Fee Due | | |||
07/15/2002 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |||
06/26/2002 | Record Retention | Destroy | | ||
06/26/2002 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | | ||
06/26/2002 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | | ||
04/03/2002 | Submitted | | |||
04/03/2002 | Submission | | |||
04/03/2002 | Submitted | | |||
01/15/2002 | Reply Brief Due | | |||
01/15/2002 | Submission | | |||
01/15/2002 | Reply Brief Filed | | |||
12/20/2001 | Motion for Extension on reply brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
12/11/2001 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
12/11/2001 | Motion for extension on reply brief filed | | |||
12/07/2001 | Brief Due | | |||
11/30/2001 | Brief Filed | | |||
11/30/2001 | Case ready to be set | | |||
11/30/2001 | Case ready to be set | | |||
11/28/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
11/19/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
11/19/2001 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
11/15/2001 | Brief Due | | |||
11/02/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
11/01/2001 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
11/01/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
10/31/2001 | Brief Due | | |||
10/01/2001 | Brief Due | | |||
10/01/2001 | Brief Filed | | |||
10/01/2001 | Record Returned | | |||
09/14/2001 | Brief Due | | |||
09/13/2001 | Record Checked Out | | |||
09/04/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
08/31/2001 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
08/31/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
08/15/2001 | Case reinstated | | |||
08/15/2001 | Motion to Reinstate Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
08/15/2001 | Case reinstated | | |||
07/17/2001 | Supplemental Clerk's Record Received | | |||
06/26/2001 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
06/26/2001 | Motion to Reinstate Appeal | | |||
09/25/2000 | Motion to stay disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
09/25/2000 | Order Entered | Abated | | ||
09/25/2000 | Order Entered | Abated | | ||
09/06/2000 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
09/06/2000 | Motion to Stay | | |||
09/03/2000 | Brief Due | | |||
08/06/2000 | Record due | | |||
08/04/2000 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||
08/03/2000 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
07/12/2000 | Letter Filed | | |||
07/06/2000 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
07/06/2000 | 125.00 Filing Fee Paid | | |||
07/06/2000 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||
07/06/2000 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
07/05/2000 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
06/07/2000 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/07/2016 | Case Stored | Clerk record or reporter record returned to district/county clerk; case destroyed |
06/24/2008 | Status | Destroy record |
12/03/2002 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Carlisle Grace, Ltd And Gordon | Appellee | Travis R Phillips |
Marigay Black | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Marigay Black |
Mckinney Independent School Di | Appellant | Larry R. Boyd |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 2
Collin
Honorable Jerry C. Lewis
002-1395-99