Case: 05-90-01145-CV
05-90-01145-CV
09/20/1990
Miscellaneous civil
Goiff, Jr., Robert
J. R. Hurt & Lawrence E. Ackels
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/23/2002 | Order Entered | Destroy | |
08/23/2001 | Record Retention | Destroy | |
03/28/1991 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/28/1991 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/04/1991 | Case Returned from Higher Ct. | Refused - No Reversible Error | |
12/14/1990 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
12/14/1990 | MattConv | | |
11/15/1990 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
11/05/1990 | Response to Motion | | |
10/25/1990 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
10/16/1990 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Denied | |
10/11/1990 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
10/10/1990 | Motion - Ext to File Bond Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
10/10/1990 | Order Entered | Dismissed | |
10/10/1990 | Order Entered | Dismissed | |
10/09/1990 | Response to Motion | | |
09/28/1990 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |
09/28/1990 | Response to Motion | | |
09/20/1990 | Motion - Ext. to File Bond | | |
09/20/1990 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
08/16/1990 | Affidavit Filed | | |
05/06/1990 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/23/2002 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
14th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable John M Marshall
89-10965-A