Case: 06-00-00135-CR
06-00-00135-CR
07/05/2000
Other Felony
David Freeman
The State of Texas
No
9th Court of Appeals
07/05/2000
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/16/2004 | Motion Disposed | Overruled | |
11/08/2004 | MOTION FILED | | |
09/24/2001 | Mandate Issued | | |
09/12/2001 | Petition for discretionary review disposed | Dismissed | |
08/08/2001 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
07/17/2001 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
07/13/2001 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |
07/11/2001 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
07/03/2001 | Motion Disposed | Overruled | |
06/27/2001 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
06/26/2001 | Submitted | | |
06/25/2001 | MOTION FILED | | |
06/05/2001 | PUR. TRAP 39.9,CASE WILL BE SMIT. W/O OA ON:21DAYS | | |
06/05/2001 | Case ready to be set | | |
06/05/2001 | Brief Filed | | |
05/21/2001 | Failure to comply with briefing rule | | |
05/21/2001 | Brief Received (Not filed b/c excess pgs or late) | | |
04/09/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/09/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
03/07/2001 | Brief Filed | | |
02/21/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/15/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
01/08/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/08/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
12/08/2000 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/08/2000 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
11/06/2000 | Reporters Record Filed | | |
10/04/2000 | Extension for record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/04/2000 | Extension for rec filed by TC clerk or Reporter | | |
08/22/2000 | Extension for record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/22/2000 | Extension for rec filed by TC clerk or Reporter | | |
07/12/2000 | Extension for record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/12/2000 | Extension for rec filed by TC clerk or Reporter | | |
07/10/2000 | LETTER | | |
07/05/2000 | | ||
07/05/2000 | | ||
06/19/2000 | Clerks Record Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/24/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
David Freeman | Appellant | Hon. David W. Barlow |
Sheri Vecera | Court Reporter | Margaret Thorne |
Freeman, David L. | Appellant | David L. Freeman |
District Clerk | Trial court clerk | Mr. John S. Appleman |
State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Alfred E. Hernandez |
State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Alfred E. Hernandez |
State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Rodney D. Conerly |
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Charles D. Carver
75692
65 years TDCJ-ID