Case: WR-40,510-01
WR-40,510-01
02/03/1999
1107-HC
CABRERA JR., ROBERTO
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/05/1999 | ACTION TAKEN | HC denied W/O written order on TC Fndgs-w/o Hear | |
05/05/1999 | ACTION TAKEN | HC denied W/O written order on TC Fndgs-w/o Hear | |
04/29/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process | | |
04/19/1999 | SUPP RECD | | |
04/19/1999 | SUPP RECD | | |
03/31/1999 | ORDER ISSUED | HC remanded TC - evidentiary hearing or affidavits | |
03/31/1999 | ORDER ISSUED | HC remanded TC - evidentiary hearing or affidavits | |
03/08/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process | | |
02/03/1999 | HC WRIT RECEIVED | | |
02/03/1999 | WRIT RECEIVED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/05/1999 | STORED | WRIT STORED |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Cabrera Jr., Roberto | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) |
Court of Appeals Information:
9th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
159th District Court
Angelina
17,662-A